|
|
1992-06-02 - 2006-04-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 35, ap.(of.) 24
|
|
|
|
2011-08-11 - 2020-02-13
Ştefan Vodă, Volintiri
|
|
|
|
2010-05-20
Drochia
|
|
|
|
2001-07-23 - 2021-03-09
mun. Chişinău, Grătieşti, str. Movilă Petru, 14
|
|
|
|
2000-10-18
Bălţi, str. Independenţei, 11, ap.(of.) 11
|
|
|
|
2003-09-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Şciusev A., 82
|
|
|
|
2012-05-28
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 3/A, ap.(of.) 36
|
|
|
|
2004-09-22 - 2018-05-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 202, ap.(of.) 145
|
|
|
|
1997-02-26
Donduşeni, str. Sîrbu Elena, 5, ap.(of.) 34
|
|
|
|
2015-01-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Studenţilor str-la, 10, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
1998-02-23 - 2019-08-21
mun. Chişinău, Budeşti
|
|
|
|
2006-06-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 65, ap.(of.) 231
|
|
|
|
2007-11-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doncev Ion, 21
|
|
|
|
2014-12-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Poştei, 92, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
2006-11-06
Bălţi, str. Boţu Pavel, 83, ap.(of.) 22
|
|
|
|
2014-10-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Academician Natalia Gheorghiu, 30, ap.(of.) 262
|
|
|
|
2000-08-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghibu Onisifor, 9/1
|
|
|
|
2011-09-06 - 2020-10-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Korolenko, 59/1, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2014-07-07
Anenii Noi, Delacău
|
|
|
|
1999-08-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Pann Anton, 4
|
|
|
|
1994-12-27 - 2020-10-26
Cimişlia, Mihailovca
|
|
|
|
2004-11-09
Rezina, str. Trandafirilor, 2/2, ap.(of.) 17
|
|
|
|
2006-12-04 - 2020-10-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Haltei, 5, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2012-09-12
Străşeni, Zubreşti
|
|
|
|
2000-02-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Grenoble, 163/2, ap.(of.) 24
|
|
|
|
2008-01-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 76
|
|
|
|
2003-01-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 75/10
|
|
|
|
2010-12-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Busuioceşti, 23, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
2010-10-28 - 2019-02-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 76/7, ap.(of.) 48
|
|
|
|
2009-10-08 - 2020-10-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Kogălniceanu Mihail, 62
|
|
|
|
2007-02-23 - 2019-07-26
Cantemir, str. Trandafirilor, 2
|
|
|
|
1995-06-20
Soroca, str. Cosăuţului, 43
|
|
|
|
2001-07-23
Ialoveni, Răzeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 25
|
|
|
|
2004-10-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghibu Onisifor, 9, ap.(of.) 59
|
|
|
|
2004-06-21 - 2020-10-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Paris, 38/3, ap.(of.) 34
|
|