|
|
2010-12-21 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 11/2, ap.(of.) 45
|
|
|
|
2007-09-19 - 2020-02-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doga Andrei, 28, ap.(of.) 95
|
|
|
|
2008-06-12 - 2020-02-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 65
|
|
|
|
2009-02-26 - 2013-02-14
Donduşeni, str. Independenţei, 1/1, ap.(of.) 67
|
|
|
|
2008-02-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Şciusev Alexei, 9, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2012-05-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Vlaicu Pârcălab, 77, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
2012-08-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 13/1
|
|
|
|
2011-08-22 - 2020-02-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 50, ap.(of.) 23
|
|
|
|
2011-10-11 - 2020-02-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 2/1, ap.(of.) 57
|
|
|
|
2002-04-22 - 2017-04-03
Floreşti, str. Gării, 6, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2013-02-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Zaikin Ivan, 2, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2007-11-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Sihastrului, 29/B
|
|
|
|
2012-10-18 - 2020-10-30
Criuleni, str. Cantemir D., 10
|
|
|
|
1993-08-02 - 2016-10-11
UTA Găgăuzia, Congaz, str. Lenin, 87
|
|
|
|
2004-04-13 - 2013-03-29
mun. Chişinău, Truşeni
|
|
|
|
2002-07-16 - 2016-06-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mioriţa, 3/1, ap.(of.) 106
|
|
|
|
2010-02-02 - 2024-04-29
Leova, str. Costin Miron, 11, ap.(of.) 13
|
|
|
|
2002-06-27 - 2005-06-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Pietrarilor, 14/1, ap.(of.) 16
|
|
|
|
2004-11-26 - 2013-10-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 18, ap.(of.) 58
|
|
|
|
2013-03-20 - 2018-11-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 42/F, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2000-04-12 - 2020-11-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 65, ap.(of.) 421
|
|
|
|
2004-11-06 - 2014-07-29
Făleşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 65, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
1992-08-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Cantemir Dimitrie bd., 3/1
|
|
|
|
2005-04-25 - 2020-11-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Valea Crucii, 2/1, ap.(of.) 27
|
|
|
|
2007-06-19 - 2019-09-10
Soroca, str. Viilor, 15, ap.(of.) 95
|
|
|
|
2011-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 44
|
|
|
|
1999-07-20 - 2024-08-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Titulescu Nicolae, 47/2, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2004-07-06 - 2013-07-22
Ungheni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 28, ap.(of.) 79
|
|
|
|
2004-07-07 - 2013-03-13
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 4, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
2012-07-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grădina Botanică, 14/3, ap.(of.) 307
|
|
|
|
2004-12-27 - 2020-11-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Plaiului, 2, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
2005-05-24 - 2015-07-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 26/1, ap.(of.) 31
|
|
|
|
2005-07-20 - 2016-07-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Coşbuc G., 13, ap.(of.) 43
|
|
|
|
2005-07-28 - 2016-03-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Cornului, 11/1, ap.(of.) 25
|
|
|
|
2005-08-22 - 2017-03-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 19/3, ap.(of.) 104
|
|