|
|
1996-01-03 - 2019-01-23
Floreşti, Vărvăreuca
|
|
|
|
2014-12-15
Bălţi, str. 31 August, 57, ap.(of.) 55
|
|
|
|
2014-03-24 - 2018-05-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Salcîmilor, 22/9, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
2009-07-21
Ungheni, str. Creangă Ion, 27, ap.(of.) 21
|
|
|
|
1998-02-09 - 2000-11-06
Glodeni, str. Tricolorului, 13
|
|
|
|
2008-07-17
Bălţi, str. Suceava, 14, ap.(of.) 43
|
|
|
|
1998-09-02 - 2001-01-24
Glodeni, str. Şciusev A., 11
|
|
|
|
2002-02-07 - 2022-02-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doina, 106, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2012-02-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Socoleni, 19/2, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
2009-06-04 - 2016-02-25
Ialoveni, Costeşti
|
|
|
|
1997-12-22 - 2002-07-26
Bălţi, str. Şevcenko T., 84
|
|
|
|
2007-02-01
Făleşti, str. 31 August, 8
|
|
|
|
2004-08-05
Cahul, str. Republicii bd., 18, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2011-11-24 - 2015-07-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Drumul Viilor, 26/1, ap.(of.) 11
|
|
|
|
2012-12-05 - 2017-10-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ismail, 116/10, ap.(of.) 25
|
|
|
|
2000-11-17 - 2017-09-19
Ştefan Vodă, str. Livezilor, 108
|
|
|
|
2005-12-12 - 2019-05-28
Floreşti, Gura Camencii
|
|
|
|
2006-04-26 - 2007-11-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 34/1, ap.(of.) 23
|
|
|
|
1998-07-23 - 2017-09-14
Ştefan Vodă, Tudora
|
|
|
|
2012-01-09
Ialoveni, str. Basarabia, 1/1, ap.(of.) 64
|
|
|
|
1998-02-11
Anenii Noi, str. Zagorodnaia, 18
|
|
|
|
2014-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Rareş Petru, 36, ap.(of.) 103
|
|
|
|
1999-03-11 - 2017-09-19
Ştefan Vodă, Crocmaz
|
|
|
|
1998-01-10 - 2017-09-19
Ştefan Vodă, str. Dudnic Petru, 5
|
|
|
|
1997-10-08 - 1999-06-28
Edineţ, str. <, 109, ap.(of.) 30
|
|
|
|
1998-03-05 - 2000-08-10
Edineţ, str. Şoseaua Bucovina, 19/6, ap.(of.) 46
|
|
|
|
1998-06-05 - 2002-10-16
Edineţ, str. Staroobreadcescaia, 39
|
|
|
|
1999-04-07 - 2001-05-22
Edineţ, str. Puşkin A., 15
|
|
|
|
2006-02-10 - 2018-11-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 11, ap.(of.) 44
|
|
|
|
2008-05-20 - 2018-11-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 2/2, ap.(of.) 68
|
|
|
|
2005-08-09
Bălţi, str. Lăutarilor, 24
|
|
|
|
1997-09-23 - 2002-05-29
Cantemir, Goteşti
|
|
|
|
2014-06-16 - 2018-11-30
Tiraspol, str. Krasnodonskaia, 43, ap.(of.) 87
|
|
|
|
1997-06-03 - 2020-01-31
Criuleni, Boşcana
|
|
|
|
2002-03-26
mun. Chişinău, Grătieşti, str. Ţarinei, 27
|
|