|
|
1995-08-23 - 2018-12-13
Edineţ, str. Bucovinei, 15, ap.(of.) 18
|
|
|
|
2007-01-10 - 2014-07-24
Cantemir, Hănăseni
|
|
|
|
2011-06-20 - 2020-08-24
Soroca, str. Iachir I., 24/2, ap.(of.) 37
|
|
|
|
1997-10-30
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Nikutov, 28
|
|
|
|
2005-01-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 9/2, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1998-03-02
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Lazo S., 3
|
|
|
|
2011-12-05 - 2022-02-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 55, ap.(of.) 308
|
|
|
|
2014-04-16 - 2017-02-14
Hînceşti, Pervomaiscoe
|
|
|
|
1998-03-25 - 2019-07-24
Cantemir, Cania
|
|
|
|
1999-12-09 - 2006-06-07
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Komarov Vl., 5, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2000-10-23 - 2010-11-09
UTA Găgăuzia, Cişmichioi
|
|
|
|
2005-01-20
Cahul, str. Negruzzi Constantin bd., 115, ap.(of.) 61
|
|
|
|
1998-01-19 - 2008-12-15
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Kalinin, 51
|
|
|
|
1993-03-19 - 2010-08-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Baurci, str. Lenin, 98
|
|
|
|
2001-04-19
UTA Găgăuzia, Cişmichioi
|
|
|
|
2001-11-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Constructorilor, 63
|
|
|
|
2007-02-08 - 2020-04-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Pobedî, 109, ap.(of.) 14
|
|
|
|
1997-11-05 - 2020-04-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Dnestrovscaia, 20
|
|
|
|
2012-04-04 - 2018-10-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 78/1, ap.(of.) 21
|
|
|
|
1999-10-22
Glodeni, Iabloana
|
|
|
|
1998-09-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 4, ap.(of.) 108
|
|
|
|
2002-02-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 42/2, ap.(of.) 16
|
|
|
|
2002-06-13 - 2009-08-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 3/3, ap.(of.) 9
|
|
|
|
2013-10-11 - 2018-12-14
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 34, ap.(of.) 45
|
|
|
|
1999-07-27 - 2005-09-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 26/1, ap.(of.) 34
|
|
|
|
2014-10-10
Glodeni, str. Moldova, 48
|
|
|
|
1994-01-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Armenească, 61/A
|
|
|
|
2002-05-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Goga Octavian, 13, ap.(of.) 9
|
|
|
|
2004-02-09 - 2009-02-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 16, ap.(of.) 150
|
|
|
|
2002-01-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Voluntarilor, 4, ap.(of.) 29
|
|
|
|
1999-07-02
Bălţi, str. Smolean, 48/A
|
|
|
|
1994-04-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bucureşti, 8, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2014-03-25 - 2018-01-17
UTA Găgăuzia, Chirsova, str. Mira, 93
|
|
|
|
1999-11-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Basarab Matei, 2/1, ap.(of.) 44
|
|
|
|
2013-01-04 - 2019-07-25
Hînceşti, Cărpineni, str. Gagarin Iu., 5
|
|