|
|
2001-02-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 63, ap.(of.) 28
|
|
|
|
2001-03-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Lvov str-la 2, 63
|
|
|
|
2008-02-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 13, ap.(of.) 186
|
|
|
|
2009-08-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Transnistria, 5/1
|
|
|
|
2008-02-22
Bălţi, str. Glavan Boris, 16
|
|
|
|
2001-07-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, 21, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2001-08-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 17/1, ap.(of.) 130
|
|
|
|
2001-08-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 15/2, ap.(of.) 17
|
|
|
|
2014-03-19 - 2020-01-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Doctor Tudor Strişca, 10
|
|
|
|
2001-09-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 6/1, ap.(of.) 115
|
|
|
|
1997-10-21 - 2019-04-12
Bălţi, str. Păcii, 35, ap.(of.) 3-3a
|
|
|
|
2001-07-03 - 2016-07-07
Hînceşti, Anini
|
|
|
|
1998-09-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Hânceşti şos., 61, ap.(of.) 403
|
|
|
|
1992-12-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 5/1, ap.(of.) 96
|
|
|
|
2014-08-04 - 2020-01-30
Bender, str. Cosmonavtov, 27, ap.(of.) 64
|
|
|
|
1992-12-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 3/3, ap.(of.) 43
|
|
|
|
1992-09-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 28, ap.(of.) 67
|
|
|
|
1993-02-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Călinescu George, 32
|
|
|
|
1999-10-21 - 2021-09-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 12, ap.(of.) 68
|
|
|
|
2002-12-04 - 2020-09-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 19, ap.(of.) 247
|
|
|
|
1999-06-09 - 2021-09-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 4, ap.(of.) 85
|
|
|
|
1993-12-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Belinski V., 59, ap.(of.) 104
|
|
|
|
2013-06-11 - 2019-05-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 61, ap.(of.) 143
|
|
|
|
1994-04-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 188/2, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
2001-10-25 - 2019-11-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Marinescu Al., 19/1, ap.(of.) 67
|
|
|
|
1995-04-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 2
|
|
|
|
1999-10-14
Soroca, str. Cosăuţului, 35
|
|
|
|
1998-02-25 - 2024-06-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Balcani şos., 6, ap.(of.) 35
|
|
|
|
1998-06-11 - 2019-11-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Şciusev A., 4, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
2000-01-05 - 2019-11-08
Ştefan Vodă, Talmaza, str. Florilor
|
|
|
|
1998-10-12 - 2019-04-11
UTA Găgăuzia, Copceac, str. Sadovaia, 14
|
|
|
|
1995-08-10
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, 2
|
|
|
|
1995-08-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Izvoarelor, 63/2, ap.(of.) 123
|
|
|
|
1995-08-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Creangă Ion, 32
|
|
|
|
1992-07-24 - 2020-11-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 128, ap.(of.) 5
|
|