|
|
2013-11-15 - 2018-11-28
Bălţi, str. Ostrovski, 2/A
|
|
|
|
1995-04-04 - 2019-05-27
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Komsomolskaia, 24
|
|
|
|
2002-09-02 - 2006-09-27
UTA Găgăuzia, Cazaclia, str. Frunze M., 81
|
|
|
|
2009-08-26 - 2023-05-12
Orhei, Sămănanca
|
|
|
|
2012-07-19 - 2021-10-29
Ialoveni, Ulmu
|
|
|
|
2003-02-25
Străşeni, Sireţi
|
|
|
|
2010-12-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lăpuşneanu A., 11, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
1993-02-26 - 2019-05-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Puşkin A., 85
|
|
|
|
2000-07-21
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Mateevici Alexei, 81/2
|
|
|
|
2014-03-11
Cimişlia, Cenac
|
|
|
|
2006-11-28 - 2009-05-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 11/2, ap.(of.) 42
|
|
|
|
1997-07-23
Tiraspol, str. Mira, 21
|
|
|
|
1995-03-09 - 2021-02-04
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Rudenco S., 27
|
|
|
|
2011-02-17 - 2024-06-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 76, ap.(of.) 608
|
|
|
|
1997-07-04
Anenii Noi, str. Chişinăului, 32, ap.(of.) 26
|
|
|
|
1997-07-04
Anenii Noi, str. <, 32, ap.(of.) 22
|
|
|
|
1997-07-04
Anenii Noi, str. Chişinăului, 26, ap.(of.) 26
|
|
|
|
2005-02-28 - 2018-10-24
Teleneşti, Suhuluceni
|
|
|
|
2007-02-28 - 2019-07-01
UTA Găgăuzia, Joltai, str. Lenin, 35
|
|
|
|
2004-07-20 - 2021-02-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 11, ap.(of.) 131
|
|
|
|
1993-02-25
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Sovetscoi Armii, 212
|
|
|
|
1998-01-23 - 2021-11-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Coloniţa, 111
|
|
|
|
2004-12-07 - 2022-02-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 17, ap.(of.) 13
|
|
|
|
2006-08-23 - 2021-02-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Voluntarilor, 16/1, ap.(of.) 75
|
|
|
|
2002-03-05
Călăraşi, Pituşca
|
|
|
|
2009-02-18 - 2021-02-04
Criuleni, Coşerniţa
|
|
|
|
2014-10-29
Făleşti, Sărata Veche
|
|
|
|
2002-03-12
mun. Chişinău, Grătieşti, str. Academiei, 4, ap.(of.) 52
|
|
|
|
2012-03-27
Bălţi, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 36, ap.(of.) 3A
|
|
|
|
2011-02-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Eminescu Mihai, 39/A, ap.(of.) 18
|
|
|
|
2008-04-07
Rezina, Slobozia-Horodişte
|
|
|
|
2014-11-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Neculce Ion, 1, ap.(of.) 28
|
|
|
|
2003-04-15 - 2008-12-09
Edineţ, str. Repin Ilia, 17
|
|
|
|
2012-02-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Şciusev A., 89
|
|
|
|
1997-09-17 - 2007-05-02
Criuleni, Dolinnoe
|
|