|
|
1992-10-06 - 2020-01-09
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 5, ap.(of.) 25
|
|
|
|
1995-09-18 - 2020-01-09
Basarabeasca, str. Marx Karl, 97, ap.(of.) 21
|
|
|
|
1992-10-01 - 2020-12-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Pann Anton, 4
|
|
|
|
1995-02-06 - 2020-02-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghibu Onisifor, 5, ap.(of.) 45
|
|
|
|
2012-07-12 - 2020-01-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 3, ap.(of.) 23
|
|
|
|
1995-01-26 - 2020-01-10
Cahul, str. Spirin V., 94, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
1995-05-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Voluntarilor, 3
|
|
|
|
1997-07-09 - 2020-05-14
Străşeni, Ghelăuza
|
|
|
|
2005-09-08 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 23
|
|
|
|
1996-02-29 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 22/6, ap.(of.) 31
|
|
|
|
2007-08-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 12
|
|
|
|
2006-12-01 - 2020-01-09
Soroca, str. Renaşterii str-la, 1
|
|
|
|
2007-02-07
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Vladimirescu Tudor str-la, 14
|
|
|
|
2014-09-01 - 2020-01-11
Drochia, str. Neaga Şt., 10
|
|
|
|
2001-12-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ceucari, 10, ap.(of.) 50
|
|
|
|
2012-03-15 - 2020-01-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 2/3, ap.(of.) 57
|
|
|
|
2008-09-30 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Grădinarilor, 12
|
|
|
|
1995-03-03 - 2023-02-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Joltai, str. Cotovschi, 30
|
|
|
|
2001-10-25
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Salcîmilor, 28
|
|
|
|
2010-06-14 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Creangă Ion, 82/1, ap.(of.) 86
|
|
|
|
1995-10-20 - 2020-01-11
Cahul, str. Viteazul Mihai, 2, ap.(of.) 62
|
|
|
|
1993-09-08 - 2020-01-11
Cahul, str. Negruzzi Constantin bd., 135, ap.(of.) 27
|
|
|
|
1992-08-11 - 2020-12-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 51/1, ap.(of.) 36
|
|
|
|
1995-03-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grenoble, 259/3
|
|
|
|
2005-11-07 - 2020-02-28
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Cantemir D., 14/A
|
|
|
|
1993-07-07 - 2020-02-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Komsomolskaia, 52
|
|
|
|
2008-03-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Uzinelor, 198
|
|
|
|
2008-07-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Lvov str-la 3, 60
|
|
|
|
1993-12-10 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, Codru, str. Schinoasa-Vale, 17/A
|
|
|
|
1992-10-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 82/8, ap.(of.) 159
|
|
|
|
2011-05-13 - 2020-01-11
Ocniţa, str. Soltîs Ion, 1/A
|
|
|
|
2001-12-20 - 2015-12-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 51, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
1997-03-05 - 2015-12-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghibu Onisifor, 1, ap.(of.) 37
|
|
|
|
1993-07-09 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 90, ap.(of.) 85
|
|
|
|
1997-10-08 - 2020-01-13
Leova, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 27
|
|