|
|
1996-05-07 - 2016-08-29
Edineţ, Gordineşti
|
|
|
|
1995-11-28 - 2016-09-16
Edineţ, str. Eminescu M., 60
|
|
|
|
1992-12-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 44, ap.(of.) 13
|
|
|
|
1997-02-11 - 2018-01-23
Soroca, str. Luceafărul, 14, ap.(of.) 19
|
|
|
|
1996-04-27 - 2019-01-11
Edineţ, str. Glavan Boris, 36
|
|
|
|
2001-01-03 - 2019-03-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Kaczynski Lech, 10/3, ap.(of.) 109
|
|
|
|
1997-01-29 - 2016-09-16
Edineţ, Cupcini, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 89
|
|
|
|
2013-02-28
Rezina, Sîrcova
|
|
|
|
1998-05-20 - 2021-02-22
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 13
|
|
|
|
1992-08-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 15/1, ap.(of.) 110
|
|
|
|
2014-07-31 - 2016-09-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 16, ap.(of.) 42
|
|
|
|
1997-11-03 - 2018-07-03
Bălţi, str. Coşbuc G., 3, ap.(of.) 13
|
|
|
|
2002-04-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 139, ap.(of.) 205
|
|
|
|
2014-07-10 - 2023-12-12
Drochia, str. Sovetscaia, 147
|
|
|
|
1993-01-25 - 2016-08-10
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Enghels F., 30
|
|
|
|
1994-03-30 - 2016-09-06
UTA Găgăuzia, Tomai, str. Kirov, 20
|
|
|
|
2010-08-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 14/1
|
|
|
|
1994-09-28 - 2020-03-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfînt bd., 73
|
|
|
|
1995-05-06 - 2018-05-03
Bălţi, str. Coroban Vasile, 8, ap.(of.) 40
|
|
|
|
1996-02-03 - 2007-05-02
Făleşti, str. Păcii, 8
|
|
|
|
1995-10-02 - 2021-08-11
Cahul, Burlacu
|
|
|
|
1995-06-28 - 2006-01-19
Bălţi, str. Păcii, 21
|
|
|
|
2006-02-01
Bălţi, str. 1 Mai, 1/2
|
|
|
|
1995-02-13 - 2018-05-03
Bălţi, str. Iorga Nicolae, 24, ap.(of.) 52
|
|
|
|
1994-09-01 - 2017-09-21
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Osvobojdenia, 12, ap.(of.) 21
|
|
|
|
1997-01-20 - 2017-09-21
UTA Găgăuzia, Gaidar, str. Lesnaia, 2
|
|
|
|
2003-12-16 - 2019-03-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 59/1, ap.(of.) 46
|
|
|
|
1993-01-12 - 2020-11-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mesager, 9
|
|
|
|
1992-09-17 - 2019-03-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 127, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2011-01-28
Ialoveni, str. Işnovăţ, 14
|
|
|
|
2006-03-27 - 2008-04-22
Bălţi, str. Russo Alecu, 2, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1996-12-27 - 2020-11-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Grenoble, 130/3, ap.(of.) 145
|
|
|
|
1994-09-28 - 2017-09-21
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Izmail, 24, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
1993-04-06 - 2019-03-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 53/2, ap.(of.) 30
|
|
|
|
1993-02-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Kaczynski Lech, 10/4, ap.(of.) 8
|
|