|
|
2015-02-24 - 2021-12-21
Şoldăneşti, Răspopeni
|
|
|
|
2011-05-05 - 2021-03-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 18/1, ap.(of.) 96
|
|
|
|
1998-12-28
Bălţi, str. Decebal, 5/a, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2013-01-04
Bălţi, str. Konev Ivan, 20, ap.(of.) 8
|
|
|
|
2015-03-10
Bălţi, str. Cehov, 23, ap.(of.) 39
|
|
|
|
2009-05-08
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Chimiştilor, 9, ap.(of.) 27
|
|
|
|
2006-09-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Orheiului, 20
|
|
|
|
2001-12-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moldoviţa, 21
|
|
|
|
2001-10-09
mun. Chişinău, Cricova, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 7, ap.(of.) 140
|
|
|
|
2014-06-26
Ialoveni, str. Bălcescu N., 60
|
|
|
|
1998-10-05 - 2018-04-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Valea Crucii, 6, ap.(of.) 35
|
|
|
|
2007-10-12 - 2018-05-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Valea Crucii, 6, ap.(of.) 198
|
|
|
|
1997-10-20
Cahul, str. Sanatoriului, 22, ap.(of.) 34
|
|
|
|
1998-04-13 - 2018-04-25
Bălţi, str. Ovidiu, 5, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1998-04-14 - 2018-04-25
Bălţi, str. Strîi, 13, ap.(of.) 92
|
|
|
|
2011-06-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Grenoble, 128/1, ap.(of.) 117
|
|
|
|
2005-04-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Florilor, 32/1
|
|
|
|
2012-06-01 - 2017-04-13
Soroca, str. Stroescu V., 53/A
|
|
|
|
2009-12-22 - 2019-08-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Uzinelor, 239/A
|
|
|
|
2007-10-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 126, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2012-08-29 - 2019-08-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Uzinelor, 88
|
|
|
|
2001-09-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 23, ap.(of.) 120
|
|
|
|
2001-03-30
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. 27 August, 14
|
|
|
|
1996-03-20 - 2014-12-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Cantemir Dimitrie bd., 5, ap.(of.) 84
|
|
|
|
2012-12-06 - 2018-06-25
Soroca, str. Trandafirilor, 9/A
|
|
|
|
2014-03-24
Soroca, str. Kogălniceanu Mihail, 15, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
2012-04-24
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Eminescu Mihai, 30, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2012-11-23
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 36/A
|
|
|
|
2006-10-12
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Creangă Ion, 15
|
|
|
|
2003-01-30
Bălţi, str. Lermontov M., 2
|
|
|
|
2011-09-14 - 2018-10-11
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Novaia, 36, ap.(of.) 22
|
|
|
|
2015-01-28 - 2018-04-27
Hînceşti, str. Hîncu Mihalcea, 213
|
|
|
|
2011-08-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. 31 August 1989, 102
|
|
|
|
2005-08-23
mun. Chişinău, Ciorescu, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 30
|
|
|
|
2010-11-30 - 2018-12-20
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 23/S, ap.(of.) 41
|
|