Cultivation of cereal, technical and fodder plants
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1992-12-29 - 2018-07-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 81, ap.(of.) 86 |
||
Administrator |
2012-06-01
Basarabeasca, Abaclia |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-10
Hînceşti, Mingir |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-14
Hînceşti, Ciuciuleni |
||
Administrator |
2004-07-14
UTA Găgăuzia, Baurci, str. Lenin, 115 |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-22
Hînceşti, Bujor |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-13
Rezina, Cuizăuca |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-28
Rezina, Păpăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-18
Şoldăneşti, Şipca |
||
Administrator |
2013-08-21
Orhei, Brăviceni |
||
Administrator |
1998-11-24 - 2015-01-23
Criuleni, Cruglic |
||
Administrator |
1999-11-29 - 2014-05-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 11/3, ap.(of.) 90 |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-15
Floreşti, str. Lazo S., 59 |
||
Administrator |
2004-11-04
Orhei, Vîşcăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-19
UTA Găgăuzia, Congaz, str. Tereşkova, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-05
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Barladean, 10 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-13
UTA Găgăuzia, Congaz, str. Tereşkova, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-18
UTA Găgăuzia, Avdarma, str. Pobedî, 4 |
||
Administrator |
1993-10-28 - 2011-04-19
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Komarov Vl., 7, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2000-09-29
Străşeni, Grebleşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-27 - 2021-09-13
Străşeni, Tătăreşti |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-13 - 2021-09-13
Străşeni, Voinova |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Drumul Crucii, 63 |
||
Administrator |
2015-01-23
Glodeni, Camenca |
||
Administrator |
2000-12-26 - 2019-09-05
Drochia, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 19, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-18 - 2021-09-13
Ialoveni, Costeşti |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-01 - 1999-09-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Hînceşti, 17, ap.(of.) 88 |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-08 - 1997-12-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 204/2, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
2009-06-16 - 2019-07-02
Cantemir, Hîrtop |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-06
Şoldăneşti, Găuzeni |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2011-11-25
Bălţi, str. Viteazul Mihai, 46 |
||
Administrator |
2008-11-14
Şoldăneşti, Cotiujenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-03
Rezina, Pecişte |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-22
Ialoveni, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 2/1, ap.(of.) 87 |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-27
Hînceşti, Călmăţui |