Retail trade of lighting appliances and household articles not included in other categories
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2012-09-28 - 2015-02-23
Sîngerei, Alexăndreni |
||
Administrator |
2012-10-05 - 2014-11-26
Făleşti, Risipeni |
||
Administrator |
2012-10-24 - 2013-03-20
Rîşcani, Costeşti, str. Prieteniei, 2, ap.(of.) 14 |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-07 - 2015-04-28
Cahul, Slobozia Mare |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-10 - 2016-09-28
Taraclia, Tvardiţa, str. Lazo S., 171 |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-16 - 2013-09-16
Cahul, Manta |
||
Administrator |
2012-01-26 - 2013-04-29
Hînceşti, Buţeni |
||
Administrator |
2012-03-15 - 2013-08-29
Hînceşti, Mingir |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-19 - 2014-03-10
Hînceşti, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 139 |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-03 - 2015-12-29
Hînceşti, Mereşeni |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-09 - 2013-04-29
Orhei, str. Braşovean Mihail, 39 |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-22 - 2017-02-28
Teleneşti, Crăsnăşeni |
||
Administrator |
2012-06-06 - 2013-11-28
Orhei, str. Valul lui Traian, 64 |
||
Administrator |
2012-06-19 - 2016-10-18
Teleneşti, Ghiliceni |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-21 - 2013-09-23
Orhei, Brăviceni |
||
Administrator |
2012-12-12 - 2016-12-29
Teleneşti, Ghiliceni |
||
Administrator |
2012-03-01 - 2013-04-16
Ştefan Vodă, Răscăieţi |
||
Administrator |
2012-06-07 - 2013-05-18
Căuşeni, Cîrnăţenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2012-10-01 - 2013-05-07
Ştefan Vodă, Cioburciu, str. Ştefan cel Mare |
||
Administrator |
2012-10-01 - 2013-11-08
Ştefan Vodă, Olăneşti, str. 31 August 1989, 1, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2012-10-16 - 2015-08-25
Ştefan Vodă, str. 31 August, 14, ap.(of.) 33 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-01 - 2014-01-24
Ştefan Vodă, Volintiri, str. Cantemir D., 738 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-21 - 2013-06-20
Căuşeni, Baimaclia, str. Şcolii, 108 |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-21 - 2013-06-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Lipatti Dinu, 13 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-22 - 2015-01-26
Ialoveni, Răzeni |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-08 - 2015-06-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Stamati C., 1, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-11 - 2015-12-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 7, ap.(of.) 43 |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-22 - 2015-04-03
Criuleni, Hruşova |
||
Administrator |
2013-09-06 - 2016-01-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 65 |
||
Administrator |
2013-09-16 - 2014-02-24
Anenii Noi, Mereni |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-04 - 2016-01-06
Făleşti, Albineţul Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-23 - 2014-12-01
Făleşti, Năvîrneţ |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-08 - 2016-01-18
Bălţi, str. Cerneahovski Ivan, 28 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-12 - 2016-03-18
Bălţi, str. Voluntarilor, 20, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-26 - 2014-01-09
Rîşcani, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 41, ap.(of.) 3 |