|
|
1996-04-05 - 2020-09-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 8/1, ap.(of.) 77
|
|
|
|
2013-03-11
UTA Găgăuzia, Congaz, str. Voroşilov, 53
|
|
|
|
1996-04-24 - 2020-09-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Lvov str-la 4, 83
|
|
|
|
1996-03-21 - 2020-09-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 10, ap.(of.) 52
|
|
|
|
1992-10-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Belgrad, 19/1
|
|
|
|
1992-10-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 10
|
|
|
|
1999-05-11 - 2023-12-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Columna, 171, ap.(of.) 23
|
|
|
|
2006-11-02 - 2021-09-20
Leova, str. Cantemir D., 38
|
|
|
|
1999-07-30 - 2020-09-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfînt bd., 8
|
|
|
|
2003-01-29
Bălţi, str. Suceava, 18, ap.(of.) 47
|
|
|
|
2008-06-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 29, ap.(of.) 60B
|
|
|
|
1998-10-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grădina Botanică, 9, ap.(of.) 305
|
|
|
|
1998-10-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grădescu Nicolae, 12
|
|
|
|
2012-04-03
Străşeni, Zubreşti
|
|
|
|
1996-03-04 - 2020-09-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 5/1, ap.(of.) 25
|
|
|
|
1997-06-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 15
|
|
|
|
2001-12-07 - 2014-02-10
Orhei, str. Piatra Neamţ, 2, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
1997-08-25
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Bogza Serghei, 28
|
|
|
|
1994-07-15 - 2018-05-29
Cahul, str. Frunze M., 57, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1999-03-11 - 2015-02-09
Ialoveni, Răzeni
|
|
|
|
2003-02-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 8, ap.(of.) 133
|
|
|
|
1993-02-26 - 2020-09-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Costin Miron, 19/2, ap.(of.) 53
|
|
|
|
1996-09-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 14/2, ap.(of.) 82
|
|
|
|
2006-05-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 63
|
|
|
|
2000-05-24 - 2021-10-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 2/1, ap.(of.) 50
|
|
|
|
2002-02-25
Cahul, str. Sanatoriului, 22, ap.(of.) 40
|
|
|
|
1995-04-12 - 2017-09-04
Cahul, str. Libertăţii, 37
|
|
|
|
2011-11-23
Soroca, str. Independenţei, 75
|
|
|
|
2003-08-21
Orhei, Mitoc
|
|
|
|
2007-09-24 - 2018-05-31
Soroca, str. Neculce Ion, 20
|
|
|
|
2004-04-01 - 2009-06-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 16/1, ap.(of.) 41
|
|
|
|
2008-04-23 - 2019-05-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Drumul Viilor, 93
|
|
|
|
1993-01-06 - 2017-12-08
Cahul, Zîrneşti
|
|
|
|
1994-11-28 - 2019-07-04
Cantemir, Capaclia
|
|
|
|
1996-02-07 - 2018-10-24
Cahul, str. Negruzzi C., 141, ap.(of.) 59
|
|